Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/22/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/22/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/22/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/22/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/04/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/04/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/26/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/26/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/26/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/10/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/10/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/10/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/10/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/17/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/17/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/17/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/17/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/17/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/24/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/24/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/24/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/24/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/07/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/07/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/14/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/27/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/10/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/23/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/23/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/23/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/02/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/01/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 11/01/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/13/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/19/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/16/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/01/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/01/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/06/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/18/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/26/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/10/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/10/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/17/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2002