Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/13/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/28/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/28/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/14/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/19/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/19/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/21/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/27/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/31/2001