Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/15/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/15/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/15/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/15/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/15/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/15/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/15/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/27/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/23/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/04/2002