Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/20/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/20/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/20/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/20/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/20/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/20/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/20/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/22/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/22/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/22/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/22/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/22/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/22/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/22/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/22/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/28/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/28/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/28/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/28/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/28/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/28/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/28/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/28/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/01/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/08/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/21/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/17/2002