Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 01/30/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/30/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/30/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 01/30/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 01/30/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/30/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 01/30/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/30/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/30/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/30/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/26/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/26/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/26/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/26/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/27/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/01/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/06/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/06/2001