Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/20/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/20/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/20/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/09/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/09/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/09/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/09/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/17/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/06/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/11/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/20/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/25/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/30/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 08/01/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/20/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/07/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 12/13/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/07/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/12/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/07/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/07/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/14/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/14/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/14/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/14/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/10/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/08/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/05/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/11/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/11/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/26/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/09/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/26/2002