Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/13/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/01/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/15/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/27/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/27/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/27/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/27/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/27/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/27/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/23/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/23/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/27/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/11/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/14/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/29/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/15/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/17/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/01/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/01/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/14/2002