There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Living Wage Responsibility Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for livable wages for Federal Government workers and workers hired under Federal contracts.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/30/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/05/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E554)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/15/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology and Procurement Policy.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
03/07/2001Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2001Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2001Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. (text of measure as introduced: CR 4/5/2001 E554-555)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2001Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. (text of measure as introduced: CR 4/5/2001 E554-555)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/20/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/15/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/11/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/12/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform03/07/2001 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Technology and Procurement Policy03/15/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce03/07/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections04/30/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.917. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2001)

Federal Living Wage Responsibility Act - Requires the Federal government and any employer under a Federal contract or subcontract exceeding $10,000 to pay each of their respective workers: (1) an hourly wage (or salary equivalent) necessary for such employee to earn, while working 40 hours a week on a full-time basis, the amount of the Federal poverty level for a family of four; and (2) an additional amount, based on the locality in which a worker resides, sufficient to cover the costs to such worker to obtain any fringe benefits not provided by the worker's employer.

Exempts employers that are: (1) small business concerns; or (2) nonprofit, tax-exempt organizations, if the ratio of the total compensation of the chief executive officer to that of the full-time equivalent of their lowest-paid employee is not greater than 25 to 1.

Directs the Secretary of Labor to enforce this Act. Makes Federal contractors that are part of a pattern or practice of violations of such wage requirements subject to Federal contract suspension, a five-year ineligibility period, and liability for Government costs of obtaining a replacement contractor. Provides for judicial review of the Secretary's determinations, and authorizes the President to suspend the provisions of this Act in times of emergency. Allows an aggrieved worker to bring a civil action against an employer for appropriate relief for a violation of this Act, if the employer has not paid or reinstated the worker as a result of the administrative action.