Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/20/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/15/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/11/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/12/2002