Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/07/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/07/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/08/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/08/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/29/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/29/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/29/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/29/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/29/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/29/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/03/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/03/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/03/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/03/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/21/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/21/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/21/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/20/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/20/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/20/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/11/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/26/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/26/2001