Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/08/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/08/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/08/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/13/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/13/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/13/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/13/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/14/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/14/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/14/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/14/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/14/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/14/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/14/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/14/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/28/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/27/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/27/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/08/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/09/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/05/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/26/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/26/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/27/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/30/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/09/2001