Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/24/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/30/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/18/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/02/2002