Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/20/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/20/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/27/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/01/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/19/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/11/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/06/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/05/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/06/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/06/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/12/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/14/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/24/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/08/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/04/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/01/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/24/2002