Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/08/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/02/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/02/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/02/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/08/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/21/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/19/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/11/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/09/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/04/2002