Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/08/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/24/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/24/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/27/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/27/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/08/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/15/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/10/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/16/2002