Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/13/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/13/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/13/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/13/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/13/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/13/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/20/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/22/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/03/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/03/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/04/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/26/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/05/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/25/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/18/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/18/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/18/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/18/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/19/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/27/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/12/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/12/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/21/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/25/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/28/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/28/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/03/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/17/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/31/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/01/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 11/07/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 12/05/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 01/23/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/15/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/17/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/16/2002