There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that Executive Order 13166 shall have no force or effect, and to prohibit the use of funds for certain purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/08/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/15/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Efficiency, Financial Management and Intergovernmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
03/08/2001Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/08/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/15/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/15/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/15/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/21/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/03/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/25/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/30/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/13/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/10/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/17/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform03/08/2001 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Efficiency, Financial Management and Intergovernmental Relations03/15/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.969.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.969. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/08/2001)

Declares Executive Order 13166, "Improving Access to Services for Persons with Limited English Proficiency," to be null and void.

Prohibits the use of funds for the promulgation or enforcement of an executive order that creates an entitlement to services provided in a language other than English.