Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/08/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/15/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/15/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/15/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/21/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/03/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/25/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/30/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/13/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/10/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/17/2002