There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Notch Baby bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Notch Fairness Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to allow workers who attain age 65 after 1981 and before 1992 to choose either lump sum payments over four years totalling $5,000 or an improved benefit computation formula under a new 10-year rule governing the transition to the changes in benefit computation rules enacted in the Social Security Amendments of 1977, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/09/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/03/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/27/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/27/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/27/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/08/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/08/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/08/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/08/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/27/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/27/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/05/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/21/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/21/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/26/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/01/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/24/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 01/24/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/13/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/05/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/03/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/03/2001 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security02/09/2001 Referred to
House Budget01/03/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.97.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.97. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2001)

Notch Fairness Act of 2001 - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to revise the formula for the computation of minimum Old Age Insurance benefits for individuals who reached age 65 in or after 1979 and to whom applies the 15-year transition period for the changes in benefit computation rules enacted in the Social Security Amendments of 1977.

Sets forth a schedule of additional benefit increases for such beneficiaries (and related beneficiaries), with percentages declining from 55 percent to five percent and keyed to the year an individual became eligible for such benefits between 1979 and 1988.

Allows such beneficiaries, in the alternative, to receive lump sum payments over four years totaling $5,000.

Directs the Director of the Office of Management and Budget, when estimating any additional spending under the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) resulting from this Act, to decrease the adjusted discretionary spending limits for budget authority and outlays for FY 2002 set forth in such Act by the increase in direct spending estimated to result from enactment of this Act for that fiscal year.