Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/20/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/20/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/20/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/22/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/22/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/12/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/12/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/26/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 08/02/2001