Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/19/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/28/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/07/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/12/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/25/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/25/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/25/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/25/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/25/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/19/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/20/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/20/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/24/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/01/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/12/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/05/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/08/2001
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/08/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/14/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/14/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew