There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the United States courthouse located at 40 Centre Street in New York, New York, as the "Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/20/2001Became Public Law No: 107-33. (TXT | PDF)
08/20/2001Signed by President.
08/10/2001Presented to President.
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8995)
08/02/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H5322-5323)
07/26/2001Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-166.
03/13/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/20/2001Became Public Law No: 107-33. (TXT | PDF)
08/20/2001Signed by President.
08/10/2001HousePresented to President.
08/06/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2001SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8995)
08/02/2001-11:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/02/2001-11:08pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5322-5323)
08/02/2001-11:07pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5321-5323)
08/02/2001-11:07pmHouseMr. LaTourette asked unanimous consent to discharge the House Calendar and consider.
07/26/2001HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 61.
07/26/2001HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-166.
07/18/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/18/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/17/2001HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
07/17/2001HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
03/14/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/13/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/13/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/13/2001 Referred to
07/18/2001 Markup by
07/26/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-166
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/14/2001 Referred to
07/17/2001 Markup by
07/17/2001 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.988. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (07/26/2001)

Designates the U.S. Courthouse located at 40 Centre Street in New York, New York, as the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse.