Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/21/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/21/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/21/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/10/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/12/2002