Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/24/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/26/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/10/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/10/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/15/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/21/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/06/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/20/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/05/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/24/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/25/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/02/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/09/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/09/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/11/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/11/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/11/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/05/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/04/2002