Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/01/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/01/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/01/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/01/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/03/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/03/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/03/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/09/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/15/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/25/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/25/2001