Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/26/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/26/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/16/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/17/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/21/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/21/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/22/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/23/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/23/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/25/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/25/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/07/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/13/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/20/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/26/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/11/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/24/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/27/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/05/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/23/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/01/2002