Text: H.Con.Res.137 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/17/2001)

 
[Congressional Bills 107th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 137 Introduced in House (IH)]







107th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. CON. RES. 137

Honoring the 129 sailors and civilians lost aboard the U.S.S. Thresher 
  on April 10, 1963, and urging the Secretary of the Army to erect a 
        memorial to this tragedy in Arlington National Cemetery.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                              May 17, 2001

    Mr. Sununu (for himself, Mr. Bass, Mr. Baldacci, and Mr. Allen) 
 submitted the following concurrent resolution; which was referred to 
 the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on 
 Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the 
  Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall 
           within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
Honoring the 129 sailors and civilians lost aboard the U.S.S. Thresher 
  on April 10, 1963, and urging the Secretary of the Army to erect a 
        memorial to this tragedy in Arlington National Cemetery.

Whereas the U.S.S. Thresher was first launched at Portsmouth Naval Shipyard on 
        July 9, 1960;
Whereas the U.S.S. Thresher departed Portsmouth Naval Shipyard for her final 
        voyage on April 9, 1963, with a crew of 16 officers, 96 sailors, and 17 
        civilians;
Whereas the mix of that crew reflects the unity of military and civilian 
        personnel in the naval submarine service, and in the protection of the 
        Nation;
Whereas at approximately 7:47 a.m. on April 10, 1963, while in communication 
        with the surface ship U.S.S. Skylark, and approximately 300 miles off 
        the coast of New England, the U.S.S. Thresher began her final descent;
Whereas the U.S.S. Thresher was declared lost with all hands on April 10, 1963; 
        and
Whereas the crew of the U.S.S. Thresher demonstrated the ``last full measure of 
        devotion'' in service to this Nation, and this devotion characterizes 
        the sacrifices of all submariners, past and present: Now, therefore, be 
        it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That the Congress--
            (1) remembers with profound sorrow the loss of the U.S.S. 
        Thresher and her gallant crew of sailors and civilians on April 
        10, 1963; and
            (2) urges the Secretary of the Army to erect a memorial in 
        Arlington National Cemetery to the crew of the U.S.S. Thresher, 
        and to all United States submariners who have lost their lives 
        in the line of duty.
                                 <all>