Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/25/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/25/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/25/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/25/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/25/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/07/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/07/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/12/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/12/2001