Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/12/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/12/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 07/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/12/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/12/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/12/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/12/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/16/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/16/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/18/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/18/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/18/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/19/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/19/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/19/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/26/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/30/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/21/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/10/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/31/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/31/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 01/29/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/05/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/16/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/17/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/09/2002