Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/19/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 06/19/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/19/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/19/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/21/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/10/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/12/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/12/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/12/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/18/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/20/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/23/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/25/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/06/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/11/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/18/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/23/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 02/26/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 02/26/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/12/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/20/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/18/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/24/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/04/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/17/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/28/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/22/2002