Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/28/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/28/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/28/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/11/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/11/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/24/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/27/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/05/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/04/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/01/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/11/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/26/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/26/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/13/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/15/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/29/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/04/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/16/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 11/14/2002