Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/10/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/10/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/06/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/06/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/12/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/12/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/12/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/25/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/05/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/05/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/05/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/05/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/05/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/05/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/12/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/12/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/16/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/16/2001