Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/12/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/21/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/04/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/12/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/12/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/29/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/31/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/19/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/04/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/04/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/04/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/06/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/30/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/15/2002