There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives and a conditional recess or adjournment of the Senate.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8875-8876; text as passed Senate: CR S8875-8876)
08/02/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H5316)
08/02/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/03/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2001SenateReceived in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8875-8876; text as passed Senate: CR S8875-8876)
08/02/2001-10:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/02/2001-10:45pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5316)
08/02/2001-10:44pmHouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5316)
08/02/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 03/08/2021 text has not been received for H.Con.Res.208 - Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives and a conditional recess or adjournment of the Senate.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.208.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.208. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (08/02/2001)

Provides for an adjournment of the House of Representatives from August 2 or 3, 2001, until September 5, 2001, and a recess or an adjournment of the Senate on any day between August 2 and 4, 2001, or between August 6 and 11, 2001, until September 4, 2001.