There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Commending Daw Aung San Suu Kyi on the 10th anniversary of her receiving the Nobel Peace Prize and expressing the sense of the Congress with respect to the Government of Burma.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14053-14054; text as passed Senate: CR S14053-14054)
12/14/2001Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
11/14/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 439).(text: CR 11/13/2001 H8039-8040)
08/02/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14053-14054; text as passed Senate: CR S14053-14054)
12/14/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 294.
12/14/2001SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
12/12/2001SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/15/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
11/14/2001-2:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2001-2:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 439). (text: CR 11/13/2001 H8039-8040)
11/14/2001-1:53pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8159-8160)
11/13/2001-2:29pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/13/2001-2:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 211.
11/13/2001-2:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8039-804)
11/13/2001-2:20pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
11/01/2001HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
11/01/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
08/02/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
08/02/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 08/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 08/02/2001
Del. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/05/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/09/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/11/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/11/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/11/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/11/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/11/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/17/2001
Del. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/30/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/30/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/06/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House International Relations08/02/2001 Referred to
11/01/2001 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations11/15/2001 Referred to
12/12/2001 Markup by
12/14/2001 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.211.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.211. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (12/14/2001)

Commends and congratulates Daw Aung San Suu Kyi on the tenth anniversary of her receiving the Nobel Peace Prize. Recognizes her contributions and work toward bringing national reconciliation and democracy to Burma.

Expresses the sense of Congress that the President and Secretary of State should continue to encourage the State Peace and Development Council (the Burmese military regime) to: (1) restore basic human rights to the Burmese people; (2) eliminate the practice of human trafficking; (3) address the manufacture of heroin and methamphetamine; (4) release all political prisoners; (5) remove all restrictions on the freedom of speech, assembly, association, and movement of Daw Aung San Suu Kyi and members of the National League for Democracy; (6) recognize the results of the 1990 democratic elections; and (7) take concrete steps to achieve national reconciliation and the restoration of democracy through genuine and substantive dialogue with Daw Aung San Suu Kyi.