Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 08/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/05/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/09/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/11/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/11/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/11/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/11/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/11/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/17/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/30/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/30/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/06/2001