Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/15/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/15/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/15/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/15/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/15/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/15/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/15/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/15/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/20/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/20/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/22/2002