Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 09/06/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/10/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 02/12/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/26/2002