Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/21/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/21/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/21/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/24/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/24/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/24/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/02/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/05/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/05/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/05/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/05/2001