Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 09/14/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/21/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/21/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/21/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/21/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/21/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/21/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/21/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/21/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/21/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/21/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/21/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/21/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/21/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/21/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/21/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/12/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/12/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/12/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/12/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/06/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/06/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/06/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/06/2002