There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the profound sorrow of the Congress for the death and injuries suffered by first responders as they endeavored to save innocent people in the aftermath of the terrorist attacks on the World Trade Center and the Pentagon on September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/30/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 0 (Roll no. 411).(text: CR H7383-7384)
09/20/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
10/31/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
10/30/2001-6:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/30/2001-6:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 0 (Roll no. 411). (text: CR H7383-7384)
10/30/2001-6:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7390)
10/30/2001-4:44pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/30/2001-4:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 233.
10/30/2001-4:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7383-7387)
10/30/2001-4:22pmHouseMr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
09/21/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/20/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/20/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (115)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/20/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/21/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/02/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/02/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/10/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/10/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/12/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/12/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/30/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/30/2001
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/30/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/20/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management09/21/2001 Referred to
Senate Judiciary10/31/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.233. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/30/2001)

Expresses the sorrow of Congress for the death and injuries suffered by first responders as they tried to save innocent people in the aftermath of the terrorist attacks on the World Trade Center and the Pentagon on September 11, 2001.

Honors and commends the first responders who participated in evacuating and rescuing the innocent people in the World Trade Center and the Pentagon after the terrorist attacks.

Encourages all levels of government to continue to work together to coordinate emergency preparedness effectively by providing the infrastructure, funding, and interagency communication and cooperation necessary to ensure that when another terrorist attack occurs, first responders will be as prepared as possible to respond to the attack effectively.