Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/20/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/21/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/02/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/02/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/10/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/10/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/12/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/12/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/30/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/30/2001
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/30/2001