There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress regarding tuberous sclerosis.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
12/12/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13078)
12/12/2001Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/04/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8766-8767)
08/01/2001Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 107-181.
02/08/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/13/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/12/2001SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13078)
12/12/2001SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/05/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
12/04/2001-3:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/04/2001-3:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8766-8767)
12/04/2001-3:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 25.
12/04/2001-3:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8766-8768)
12/04/2001-3:38pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
08/01/2001HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 67.
08/01/2001HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 107-181.
07/19/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
07/19/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/11/2001HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/11/2001HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
02/14/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/08/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/08/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/14/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/14/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/06/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/07/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/07/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/08/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/08/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/08/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/08/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/25/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/14/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/26/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/18/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/30/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/08/2001 Referred to
07/19/2001 Markup by
08/01/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-181
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/14/2001 Referred to
07/11/2001 Markup by
07/11/2001 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions12/05/2001 Referred to
12/12/2001 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.25. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/04/2001)

Expresses the sense of Congress regarding the fight against tuberous sclerosis with respect to the role of: (1) all Americans; (2) national and community organizations and health care providers; (3) the Federal Government; and (4) the National Institutes of Health.