Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/17/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/17/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/17/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/17/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/17/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/17/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/17/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/17/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/17/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/30/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/30/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/30/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/30/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/30/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/30/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/30/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/30/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/30/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/30/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/30/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/30/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/30/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/30/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/30/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/30/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/30/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/07/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/07/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/07/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/07/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/07/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/07/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/07/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/14/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/14/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/30/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/30/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/30/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/30/2001