Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/04/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/04/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/04/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/04/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 12/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 12/04/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/04/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/04/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/19/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/04/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/04/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/07/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/07/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/07/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/07/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/07/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/07/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/12/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/26/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/26/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/26/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/18/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/18/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/18/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/22/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/22/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/22/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/22/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/22/2002