Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/14/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/15/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/27/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/28/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/29/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/10/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/12/2001