Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/19/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/17/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/17/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 12/17/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/17/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/17/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/04/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/04/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/05/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/05/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/18/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/17/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/15/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/17/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/18/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/18/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/18/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/11/2002