Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 11/15/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 11/15/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/15/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 12/04/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 12/04/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 12/12/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 12/13/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/28/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/06/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/06/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/10/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/30/2002