Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/05/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/05/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/05/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 12/05/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 12/05/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 12/05/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/05/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/05/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/05/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 12/05/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/05/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 12/05/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/05/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/05/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/05/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/11/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/11/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 12/18/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/18/2001