Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 12/06/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 12/06/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 12/06/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 12/11/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/11/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/11/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/11/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/11/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/11/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/11/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/11/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/11/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/11/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/11/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/13/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/13/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/13/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/13/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/13/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/13/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 12/13/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 12/13/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/17/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/17/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/17/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 12/20/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/05/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/05/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/05/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/05/2002